This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 03/20/2018 at 11:01:46 (UTC).

State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue VS Christena Bligh Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/16/2017 State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against Christena Bligh. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Whitten, Christopher. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0204

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Whitten, Christopher

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue

Defendants

Christena Bligh

Arizona Lizanatay L L C

Dallas Bligh

Christopher R Kaup

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Penny Moore

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2018
  • 042 - ME: Case Dismissed - Full (docket date:3/8/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • 314 - ME: Bankruptcy (docket date:7/19/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • MOT - Motion (docket date:6/8/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • NOTE: Motion to Stay Proceedings

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:5/25/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • NOTE: CHRISTENA BLIGH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:5/25/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • NOTE: DALLAS BLIGH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • SUM - Summons (docket date:5/24/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • NOB - Notice Of Filing Bankruptcy (docket date:5/3/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • NOTE: Notice of Filing Notice of Removal OF CIVIL ACTION TO BANKRUPTCY COURT PURSUANT TO BANKRUPTCY RULE 9027(a)(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:4/12/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • NOTE: CHRISTOPHER R KAUP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • SUM - Summons (docket date:4/12/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • NOTE: CIVIL/

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • ACS - Acceptance Of Service (docket date:4/10/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • NOTE: Acceptance of Service OF PROCESS as to Defendants Dallas Bligh and Christena Bligh

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • COM - Complaint (docket date:3/20/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • CSH - Coversheet (docket date:3/20/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less