This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 01/18/2021 at 05:09:18 (UTC).

State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue VS Anne E Knutson

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against Anne E Knutson. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Viola, Danielle. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0906

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Viola, Danielle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue

Defendants

Anne E Knutson

Dale Knutson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Wendy Gillott

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2020
  • JudgementJudgment For: State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue Judgment Against: Anne E Knutson Judgment Against: Dale Knutson, Amount: $11,100.80, Frequency: One Time, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • JudgementJudgment For: State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue Judgment Against: Anne E Knutson Judgment Against: Dale Knutson, Amount: $4,600.98, Frequency: One Time, Type: Charges

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • JudgementJudgment For: State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue Judgment Against: Anne E Knutson Judgment Against: Dale Knutson, Amount: $6,380.50, Frequency: One Time, Type: Interest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketJUD - Judgment (docket date:11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Notice of Amended Caption

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketNOT - Notice (docket date:11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Stipulation to Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketSFJ - Stipulation For Judgment (docket date:11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketNOTE: DALE KNUTSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:10/5/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketNOTE: ANNE E KNUTSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:10/5/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:10/1/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:10/1/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less