This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 07/11/2016 at 07:15:19 (UTC).

State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue VS Andrew N Garcia

Case Summary

On 03/02/2000 State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against Andrew N Garcia. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northeast Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Whitten, Christopher. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0046

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2000

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Courthouse:

    Northeast Regional Court Center

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Whitten, Christopher

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue

Defendant

Andrew N Garcia

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lisa Neuville

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

04/27/2000

ORD - Order (docket date:5/4/2000) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/27/2000

NOTE: TO QUASH ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE & ORDER OF DISMISSAL W/O PREJUDICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/24/2000

MOT - Motion (docket date:4/26/2000) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/24/2000

NOTE: TO QUASH ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/29/2000

OSC - Order To Show Cause (docket date:4/4/2000) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/29/2000

AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:4/4/2000)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/29/2000

NOTE: P2 SERVED 3-22-2000

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/02/2000

COM - Complaint (docket date:3/6/2000) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less