This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 03/20/2018 at 11:07:39 (UTC).

State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue VS Alyssa Nowlin

Case Summary

On 05/08/2017 State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against Alyssa Nowlin. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Whitten, Christopher. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0279

  • Filing Date:

    05/08/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Whitten, Christopher

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue

Defendant

Alyssa Nowlin

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lindsay Hughes

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2017
  • DFJ - Default Judgment (docket date:8/9/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • NOTE: Copy mailed/provided to non-defl. parties on date of filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • MAJ - Mot/Aff Entry Def Jud W/O Hear (docket date:7/11/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • NOTE: Motion for Default Judgment without Hearing and Affidavit in Support of Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court (docket date:6/15/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default (docket date:6/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • NOTE: Application for Entry of Default and Re Military Service Entry of Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:5/25/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • NOTE: ALYSSA NOWLIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • SUM - Summons (docket date:5/24/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • COM - Complaint (docket date:5/10/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • CSH - Coversheet (docket date:5/10/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • Judgment For: State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue Judgment Against: Alyssa Nowlin, Amount: $5,987.68, Frequency: One Time, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • Judgment For: State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue Judgment Against: Alyssa Nowlin, Amount: $1,961.00, Frequency: One Time, Type: Charges

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • Judgment For: State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue Judgment Against: Alyssa Nowlin, Amount: $1,810.76, Frequency: One Time, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less