This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 07/18/2016 at 04:46:25 (UTC).

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company VS Seneca Lynell Adams

Case Summary

On 09/03/2014 State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company filed an Other lawsuit against Seneca Lynell Adams. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Southeast Court Complex located in Maricopa, Arizona. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5658

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Southeast Court Complex

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Defendant

Seneca Lynell Adams

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Richard Reed

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

03/17/2015

019 - ME: Ruling (docket date:3/17/2015)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/05/2015

MXS - Motion To Extend Time For Service (docket date:3/6/2015)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/05/2015

NOTE: Motion To Extend Time for Service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/04/2015

323 - ME: Jdgmnt Dismissal - Lack Srv (docket date:3/4/2015)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/04/2015

311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry (docket date:2/4/2015)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/10/2014

322 - ME: Notice Of Intent To Dismiss (docket date:12/10/2014)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/03/2014

COM - Complaint (docket date:9/8/2014)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/03/2014

CCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To (docket date:9/8/2014)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/03/2014

CSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/8/2014)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less