This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/10/2021 at 17:02:43 (UTC).

Stacy Fedler VS Daniel Sester

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Stacy Fedler filed an Other lawsuit against Daniel Sester. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Stephens, Sherry. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1740

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Stephens, Sherry

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stacy Fedler

Defendant

Daniel Sester

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Laura Bramnick

Defendant Attorney

Cameron Morgan

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2020
  • Docket023 - ME: Order Entered By Court (docket date:12/1/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Defendant's Answer - EFILE BILLING $245

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketANS - Answer (docket date:11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Amended Application for Entry of Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketAAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default (docket date:11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • Docket023 - ME: Order Entered By Court (docket date:11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Application for Entry of Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketAAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default (docket date:11/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Certificate Of Compulsory Arbitration - Is Not Subject To

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Complaint - Partition of Real Property

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less