Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 07/25/2016 at 11:56:25 (UTC).

Sridhar Manthangodu Et Al VS City Of Pontiac General Employees Retirment System Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/23/2015 Sridhar Manthangodu filed an Other lawsuit against City Of Pontiac General Employees Retirment System. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northeast Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Bergin, Dawn. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4087

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Northeast Regional Court Center

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Bergin, Dawn

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Sridhar Manthangodu

Liang Jiawei

Defendants

City Of Pontiac General Employees Retirment System

Todd Davis

David Cowan

Roy A Guthrie

Albert A Pimentel

Thomas J Ridge

Gary Briggs

Lifelock Inc

Others

Hillary Schneider

Chini Krishnan

Srinivasan Krishnan

Chris Power

Clarissa Cerda

Jaynie Miller Studenmund

Richard Todd Davis

Russell Sprouse

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael McKay

Robert Carey

Other and Defendant Attorneys

Cynthia Ricketts

Jake Curtis

Hart Robinovitch

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2016
  • 028 - ME: Status Conference Set (docket date:7/14/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2016
  • 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court (docket date:7/11/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2016
  • ORD - Order (docket date:7/11/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2016
  • NOTE: ORDER PRELIMINARILY APPROVING STOCKHOLDER DERIVATIVE SETTLEMENT AND PROVIDING FOR NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2016
  • MOT - Motion (docket date:7/5/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2016
  • NOTE: Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Shareholder Derivative Settlement and Incorporated Memorandum of Points and Authorities

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2016
  • MOT - Motion (docket date:7/5/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2016
  • NOTE: Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • 002 - ME: Hearing Vacated (docket date:4/15/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • PHO - Pro Hac Vice Order (docket date:4/12/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
149 More Docket Entries
  • 10/21/2015
  • NOTE: Order Transferring Action to Commercial Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2015
  • NAR - Notice Of Appearance (docket date:10/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2015
  • NOTE: Notice of Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2015
  • CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid (docket date:10/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2015
  • NOTE: Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2015
  • MTT - Motion To Transfer (docket date:10/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2015
  • NOTE: Joint Motion to Transfer to Commercial Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2015
  • COM - Complaint (docket date:9/25/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2015
  • CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:9/25/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2015
  • CSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/25/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less