This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/10/2021 at 16:53:43 (UTC).

Sofi Lending Corp VS Kirk Petersdorf

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Sofi Lending Corp filed an Other lawsuit against Kirk Petersdorf. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1688

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sofi Lending Corp

Defendants

Kirk Petersdorf

Shelley Petersdorf

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Douglas Christensen

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2020
  • JudgementJudgment For: Sofi Lending Corp Judgment Against: Kirk Petersdorf Judgment Against: Shelley Petersdorf, Amount: $28,611.02, Frequency: One Time, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • JudgementJudgment For: Sofi Lending Corp Judgment Against: Kirk Petersdorf Judgment Against: Shelley Petersdorf, Amount: $406.40, Frequency: One Time, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketSTJ - Stipulated Judgment (docket date:11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Stipulation to Judgment (SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketSFJ - Stipulation For Judgment (docket date:11/5/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketNOTE: AMENDING CAPTION OF THE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketORD - Order (docket date:11/2/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketNOTE: MOTION TO AMEND CAPTION OF THE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketMTA - Motion To Amend (docket date:10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • DocketNOTE: CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • DocketNOTE: CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • DocketNOTE: KIRK PETERSDORF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less