This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 01/22/2013 at 05:59:42 (UTC).

Shileatha Hawkins-Jemison Et Al VS La Donna Holcomb

Case Summary

On 10/16/2012 Shileatha Hawkins-Jemison filed an Other lawsuit against La Donna Holcomb. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Maricopa County Northwest Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Willett, Eileen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1062

  • Filing Date:

    10/16/2012

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Willett, Eileen

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Shileatha Hawkins-Jemison

Tarryl Jemison

Defendant

La Donna Holcomb

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

11/27/2012

DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:12/4/2012)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/19/2012

DocketANS - Answer (docket date:11/28/2012) (filing party: Defendant(3))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/19/2012

DocketNOTE: DEFERRED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/19/2012

DocketODF - Order Deferring Court Fees (docket date:11/27/2012)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/19/2012

DocketADW - Application Deferral/Waiver (docket date:11/27/2012) (filing party: Defendant(3))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/19/2012

DocketANS - Answer (docket date:10/24/2012) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/19/2012

DocketNOTE: DEFERRED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/16/2012

DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:10/18/2012) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/16/2012

DocketODF - Order Deferring Court Fees (docket date:10/18/2012) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/16/2012

DocketADW - Application Deferral/Waiver (docket date:10/18/2012) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/16/2012

DocketCCA - Cert Compulsory Arbitration (docket date:10/18/2012) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/16/2012

DocketASA - Affidavit in Support of Application for Deferral or Waiver of Service Process Costs (docket date:10/18/2012) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less