Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 06/01/2016 at 09:53:16 (UTC).

Sherryl L Madison VS New Century Mortgage Corporation Et Al

Case Summary

On 04/08/2008 Sherryl L Madison filed an Other lawsuit against New Century Mortgage Corporation. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northeast Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1223

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Northeast Regional Court Center

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sherryl L Madison

Defendants

New Century Mortgage Corporation

Washington Mutual Home Loans

Town & Country Title Services Inc

Washington Mutual Bank

Unified Capital Group Inc

California Reconveyance Company

D H I Title Of Arizona

Argent Mortgage Company L L C

Town & Country Services Inc

Ticor Title Of Arizona Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Roger Foote

Robert Rutila

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2009
  • AIX - Appeals Index (docket date:8/19/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2009
  • LET - Letter (docket date:8/19/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2009
  • NOTE: CERTIFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2009
  • NOT - Notice (docket date:7/24/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2009
  • NOTE: APPELLANTS FILING FEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2009
  • CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt (docket date:7/24/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2009
  • LET - Letter (docket date:7/15/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2009
  • AIX - Appeals Index (docket date:7/15/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2009
  • MOT - Motion (docket date:7/16/2009) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2009
  • NOTE: FOR STAY OF ORDER RULE 7(A) OF THE ARIZ R APP PROC

    Read MoreRead Less
71 More Docket Entries
  • 04/14/2008
  • SUM - Summons (docket date:4/17/2008) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2008
  • SUM - Summons (docket date:4/17/2008) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2008
  • SUM - Summons (docket date:4/17/2008) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2008
  • SUM - Summons (docket date:4/17/2008) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2008
  • SUM - Summons (docket date:4/17/2008) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2008
  • SUM - Summons (docket date:4/17/2008) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2008
  • COM - Complaint (docket date:4/9/2008) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2008
  • CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:4/9/2008) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2008
  • NOT - Notice (docket date:4/9/2008) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2008
  • NOTE: OF LIS PENDENS PURSUANT TO ARS 12-1191(A)

    Read MoreRead Less