This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/19/2021 at 01:00:23 (UTC).

Sheila Gay Coleman VS James Michael Coleman

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Sheila Gay Coleman filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against James Michael Coleman. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Astrowsky, Brad. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4108

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Astrowsky, Brad

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Sheila Gay Coleman

Respondent

James Michael Coleman

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/24/2020
  • DocketNOTE: TO SERVE BY PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • DocketORD - Order (docket date:12/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketNOTE: TO SERVE BY / PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketMOT - Motion (docket date:12/16/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketNLS - Notice Of Lack Of Service (docket date:11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketODF - Order Deferring Court Fees (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketASA - Affidavit in Support of Application for Deferral or Waiver of Service Process Costs (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketADW - Application Deferral/Waiver (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPIN - Preliminary Injunction (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less