This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 11/23/2020 at 02:34:15 (UTC).

Shawn L Ince VS Katherine G Ince

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Shawn L Ince filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Katherine G Ince. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Southeast Court Complex located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Blanchard, John. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6855

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southeast Court Complex

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Blanchard, John

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Shawn L Ince

Respondent

Katherine G Ince

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Douglas Gardner

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketNOTE: PLACING CASE ON INACTIVE CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketORD - Order (docket date:11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketNOTE: MOTION TO PLACE CASE ON INACTIVE CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketNOS - Notice Of Settlement (docket date:11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketAAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default (docket date:11/3/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketAFI - Affidavit of Financial Information, Restricted after 1/1/06 (docket date:10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketACS - Acceptance Of Service (docket date:10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: OF STRICT COMPLIANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOT - Notice (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNAR - Notice Of Appearance (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPIN - Preliminary Injunction (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less