This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 11/05/2020 at 04:24:19 (UTC).

Shane Kreinheder VS Jessica Krienheder

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Shane Kreinheder filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Jessica Krienheder. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northeast Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Blaney, Scott. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3011

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Northeast Regional Court Center

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Blaney, Scott

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Shane Kreinheder

Respondent

Jessica Krienheder

Minor

Party is a minor: name not published

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Michelle Carlton

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:10/1/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNAR - Notice Of Appearance (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketONA - Ord & Notice Attend Parent Inf (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPIN - Preliminary Injunction (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less