This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/19/2021 at 18:40:33 (UTC).

Shamara Samantha Thomas VS Alvin Lewis Hearon

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Shamara Samantha Thomas filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Alvin Lewis Hearon. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northeast Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Schwartz, Aryeh. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3009

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Northeast Regional Court Center

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Schwartz, Aryeh

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Shamara Samantha Thomas

Respondent

Alvin Lewis Hearon

Minor

Party is a minor: name not published

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketNOTE:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketRNM - Returned Mail (docket date:2/3/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • JudgementJudgment Against:, Frequency: One Time, Type: Judgment Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Copy of Decree Mailed/Provided to parties on date of filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketCDS - Consent Decree (docket date:12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketCAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid (docket date:11/3/2020) (filing party: Respondent(2))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketADW - Application Deferral/Waiver (docket date:11/3/2020) (filing party: Respondent(2))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketODF - Order Deferring Court Fees (docket date:11/3/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Parent Education Certificate

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPIN - Preliminary Injunction (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketAFC - Affidavit Regarding Minor Children (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketONA - Ord & Notice Attend Parent Inf (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPWC - Parent Worksheet/Child Support (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: SOLE LEGAL DECISION MAKING TO PARTY A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPPL PARENTING PLAN (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less