This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 10/14/2020 at 10:19:09 (UTC).

Shali Manuelito VS Travis Wilson

Case Summary

On 08/02/2019 Shali Manuelito filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Travis Wilson. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Southeast Court Complex located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are Otis, Erin, Russell, Andrew and Davis, Marvin. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4739

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southeast Court Complex

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

Otis, Erin

Russell, Andrew

Davis, Marvin

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Shali Manuelito

Respondent

Travis Wilson

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2019
  • JudgementJudgment Against:, Frequency: One Time, Type: Judgment Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketNOTE: Copy of Decree Mailed/Provided to parties on date of filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketDFS - Default Decree (docket date:12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketMAD - Motion And Affidavit For Default Dissolution (docket date:11/20/2019) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketAAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default (docket date:9/23/2019) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:9/9/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:9/9/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • DocketASA - Affidavit in Support of Application for Deferral or Waiver of Service Process Costs (docket date:8/5/2019) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • DocketODF - Order Deferring Court Fees (docket date:8/5/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • DocketADW - Application Deferral/Waiver (docket date:8/5/2019) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • DocketNCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins (docket date:8/5/2019) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • DocketPIN - Preliminary Injunction (docket date:8/5/2019) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:8/5/2019) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:8/5/2019) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:8/5/2019) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less