Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 05/31/2016 at 13:09:40 (UTC).

Shakirah-Joy Karim VS Shamrock Glen L L C Et Al

Case Summary

On 07/19/2010 Shakirah-Joy Karim filed an Other lawsuit against Shamrock Glen L L C. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northeast Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Hannah, John. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2911

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Northeast Regional Court Center

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Hannah, John

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Shakirah-Joy Karim

Defendants

Shamrock Glen L L C

Americas Wholesale Lender

First American Title Insurance Company

Capital Title Company

Bank Of America N A

Lawyers Title Of Arizona Inc

Countrywide Home Loans Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Harvey Dye

Defendant Attorneys

Marty Baker

Richard Cobb

Coree Neumeyer

Stacy Luedtke

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2014
  • ODI - Order Of Dismissal (docket date:9/16/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2014
  • NOTE: ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHPREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2014
  • SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal (docket date:9/4/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2014
  • NOTE: STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2014
  • SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal (docket date:9/2/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2014
  • NOTE: STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2014
  • NOT - Notice (docket date:8/26/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2014
  • NOTE: Notice of Release and Expungement of Lis Pendens

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2014
  • 375 - Case on Dismissal Calendar (docket date:8/6/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2014
  • NOS - Notice Of Settlement (docket date:7/28/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
145 More Docket Entries
  • 08/18/2010
  • NUS - Notice Of Removal Us District Court (docket date:8/19/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2010
  • NOTE: Notice of Removal to Federal Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2010
  • CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid (docket date:8/17/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2010
  • NAR - Notice Of Appearance (docket date:8/19/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2010
  • COM - Complaint (docket date:7/20/2010) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2010
  • CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:7/20/2010) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2010
  • NOT - Notice (docket date:7/20/2010) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2010
  • NOTE: OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2010
  • ADW - Application Deferral/Waiver (docket date:7/20/2010) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2010
  • ODF - Order Deferring Court Fees (docket date:7/20/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less