This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 05/26/2016 at 21:13:44 (UTC).

Selectbuild Arizona L L C VS Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation Et Al

Case Summary

On 12/02/2008 Selectbuild Arizona L L C filed an Other lawsuit against Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Maricopa County Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Mullins, Karen. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0510

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Mullins, Karen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Selectbuild Arizona L L C

Defendants

Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation

McQueen Professional Plaza L L C

Safeguard Security And Communications Inc

Stucco Guy Inc, The

Roofing Supply Of Arizona Inc

P F G Construction Inc

M T J Electric Inc

Anchor Roofing Systems Inc

H D Supply Waterworks L P

Mitchell-Mccain Construction L L C

H D Supply Inc

3Rd Party Defendants

Embeds R Us L L C

S R Bray Corp

Sunbelt Rentals Inc

Nicholas Consolidated Inc

Supply Network Inc

California Wholesale Material Supply L L C

Arcadia Inc

D J B Enterprises Ltd

5 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Christopher Berry

Defendant Attorneys

Matthew Bedwell

Nancy Swift

Claudio Iannitelli

3Rd Party Defendant Attorneys

James Reed

Karen Palecek

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2012
  • Docket047 - ME: Judgment Of Dismissal (docket date:5/4/2012)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2012
  • Docket078 - ME: Case On Dismissal Calendar (docket date:2/13/2012)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2010
  • DocketOCC - Order Continuing On Inactive Calendar (docket date:11/17/2010)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2010
  • DocketNOTE: ORDER CONTINUINGMATTER ON THE INACTIVECALENDAR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2010
  • DocketDFJ - Default Judgment (docket date:12/1/2010)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2010
  • DocketNOTE: Copy mailed/provided to non-defl. parties on date of filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2010
  • DocketMOT - Motion (docket date:11/12/2010)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2010
  • DocketNOTE: FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT OF DEFENDANT THE STUCCO GUY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2010
  • DocketAFD - Affidavit On Default (docket date:11/12/2010)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2010
  • DocketNOTE: IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT OF DEFENDANT THE STUCCO GUY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
273 More Docket Entries
  • 12/09/2008
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:12/12/2008)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2008
  • DocketNOTE: ROOFING SUPPLY OF ARIZONA INC SERVED 12/03/08

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2008
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:12/12/2008)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2008
  • DocketNOTE: MTJ ELECTRIC INC SERVED 12/03/08

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2008
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:12/12/2008)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2008
  • DocketNOTE: HD SUPPLY WATERWORKS LP SERVED 12/03/08

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2008
  • DocketNOT - Notice (docket date:12/10/2008)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2008
  • DocketNOTE: OF LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2008
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:12/4/2008)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2008
  • DocketCCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:12/4/2008)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less