This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/26/2021 at 07:15:04 (UTC).

Scott Seemuth VS Hickmans Egg Ranch Inc

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Scott Seemuth filed an Other lawsuit against Hickmans Egg Ranch Inc. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Duncan, Sally. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1694

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Duncan, Sally

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Scott Seemuth

Defendant

Hickmans Egg Ranch Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joel Robbins

Defendant Attorney

Adam Polson

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2021
  • HearingEvent: Pre-Trial Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketSCO Scheduling Order (docket date:11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Joint Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketJSR Joint Scheduling Report (docket date:11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketNOTE: DEFENDANT HICKMAN EGG RANCH, INC.'S DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketNJT - Not Demand For Jury Trials (docket date:10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketNOTE: DEFENDANT HICKMAN EGG RANCH, INC.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT / efile billing $245.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketANS - Answer (docket date:10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketNOTE: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketNJT - Not Demand For Jury Trials (docket date:9/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Certificate Of Compulsory Arbitration - Is Not Subject To

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less