This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 11/05/2020 at 04:21:16 (UTC).

Sarah M Jones VS Michael A Shapiro

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Sarah M Jones filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Michael A Shapiro. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is LaBianca, Margaret. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4121

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

LaBianca, Margaret

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Sarah M Jones

Respondent

Michael A Shapiro

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketACS - Acceptance Of Service (docket date:10/6/2020) (filing party: Respondent(2))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins (docket date:9/25/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPIN - Preliminary Injunction (docket date:9/25/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/25/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:9/25/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/25/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less