Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 06/28/2016 at 14:20:23 (UTC).

Sarah Hamblett VS H S L Properties Financial Corporation Et Al

Case Summary

On 07/24/2015 Sarah Hamblett filed an Other lawsuit against H S L Properties Financial Corporation. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Kiley, Daniel. The case status is Pending - Trial.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2082

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Trial

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Kiley, Daniel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sarah Hamblett

Defendants

H S L Properties Financial Corporation

Madison-M F Casa Santa Fe A Z, L L C

Casa Santa Fe Apartments

H S L Asset Management L L C

H S L Financial Management L L C

H S L, R E Holdings L L C

Santa Fe Properties L L C

H S L Properties Management Inc

Casa Santa Fe Apartments L L C

H S L Casa Santa Fe Properties L L C

H S L Properties Inc

H S L Opportunity Management I I I, L L C

In Re

Mackenzie Hamblett

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mark Breyer

Defendant Attorney

Nathan Metzger

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2016
  • NNF - Not Of Non-Parties At Fault (docket date:6/7/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2016
  • NOTE: Defendants Notice of Non-Parties at Fault

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • 089 - ME: Trial Setting (docket date:5/17/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2016
  • NSD - Notice of Service Re: 26.1 Disclosure (docket date:5/12/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2016
  • NOTE: Notice of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • 026 - ME: Pretrial Conference Set (docket date:3/15/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • JSR Joint Scheduling Report (docket date:3/9/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • NOTE: Joint Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • NJT - Not Demand For Jury Trials (docket date:2/3/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • NOTE: Defendants HSL Casa Santa Fe Properties and HSL Asset Management, LLC's Demand for Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 11/10/2015
  • NOTE: CASA SANTA FE APARTMENTS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • 322 - ME: Notice Of Intent To Dismiss (docket date:10/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2015
  • STP - Stipulation (docket date:10/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2015
  • NOTE: Stipulation to Amend Caption

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2015
  • AMC - Amended Complaint (docket date:10/2/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2015
  • NOTE: First Amended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2015
  • COM - Complaint (docket date:7/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2015
  • CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:7/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2015
  • CSH - Coversheet (docket date:7/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2015
  • NJT - Not Demand For Jury Trials (docket date:7/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less