This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 06/15/2016 at 13:59:21 (UTC).

Ryan Mechanical Co VS Speedy Gonzalez Construction Inc Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/06/2009 Ryan Mechanical Co filed an Other lawsuit against Speedy Gonzalez Construction Inc. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Southeast Court Complex located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Brodman, Roger. The case status is Other - Consolidated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1440

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2009

  • Case Status:

    Other - Consolidated

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southeast Court Complex

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Brodman, Roger

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ryan Mechanical Co

Defendants

Speedy Gonzalez Construction Inc

Windsor Boulder Ridge L L C

Red Mountain Machinery Company

Meridian Bank National Association

Baron Financial L L C

Windsor Las Piedras L L C

D J M Construction Inc

Equus Development Coproration

Windsor Commercial Construction L L C

Associated Finishes Inc

Accent Construction L L C

Marlam Industries Inc

Gordon Construction Co Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert Sewell

Defendant Attorney

Chase Halsey

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2010
  • 053 - ME: Case Consolidation (docket date:3/15/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2009
  • 029 - ME: Status Conference (docket date:7/31/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2009
  • SUM - Summons (docket date:6/22/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2009
  • SUM - Summons (docket date:6/22/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2009
  • SUM - Summons (docket date:6/22/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2009
  • SUM - Summons (docket date:6/22/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2009
  • SUM - Summons (docket date:6/22/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2009
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:6/22/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2009
  • NOTE: ACCENT CONSTRUCTION LLC SERVED 06/18/09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2009
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:6/22/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 06/19/2009
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:6/22/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2009
  • NOTE: GORDON CONSTRUCTION CO INC SERVED 06/18/09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2009
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:6/22/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2009
  • NOTE: RED MOUNTAIN MACHINERY COMPANY SERVED 06/18/09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2009
  • MCD - Motion To Consolidate (docket date:6/19/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2009
  • NOTE: Gordon Construction Co., Incs Joinder In Motion To Consolidate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2009
  • WSS - Waiver Of Service Of Summons (docket date:5/29/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2009
  • NOTE: BARRON FINANCIAL LLC 5/19/09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2009
  • COM - Complaint (docket date:5/7/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2009
  • CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:5/7/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less