This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/12/2021 at 22:11:26 (UTC).

Ronale Bhakta

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Ronale Bhakta was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Southeast Court Complex located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are Popham, Jr, Gary and Lynch, Steven. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5182

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southeast Court Complex

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

Popham, Jr, Gary

Lynch, Steven

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ronale Bhakta

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2020
  • HearingEvent: Name Change Hearing; Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Copy of order mailed/provided to parties on date of filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketOCN - Order Change of Name (docket date:11/3/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/25/2020) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketAPE - Application/Petition (docket date:9/25/2020) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

    Read MoreRead Less