Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 06/25/2016 at 00:52:47 (UTC).

Roger Ashkenazi Et Al VS Joseph L Baldino Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/10/2014 Roger Ashkenazi filed an Other lawsuit against Joseph L Baldino. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Brodman, Roger. The case status is Pending - Trial.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0071

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Trial

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Brodman, Roger

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Roger Ashkenazi

Alan Bandler

Alan Bandler I R A Sun America

Terri Bandler I R A Rollover Sun America

Linda Barkalow I R A E-Trade Securities

Charlotte Barkley

Shauna Barkley

Silvia Bighi

Bighi & Associates

Jon Bliven

Paul L Bruno

P B, Co Inc

Dick J Dijkman I R A First Trust Co Of Onaga K S

A H Earley

Sheldon Epstein

Sheldon Epstein I R A First Trust Company Of Onaga

Karen M Epstein

Michael D Epstein

Michael D Epstein Roth I R A First Trust Company Of Onaga

Michael D Epstein I R A First Trust Company Of Onaga

60 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David Weatherwax

Other Attorneys

Dennis Wilenchik

Robert Sullivan

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2016
  • 926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling (docket date:6/22/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2016
  • NOT - Notice (docket date:6/23/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2016
  • NOTE: Notice of Lodging [Proposed] Judgment on Count I of the Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2016
  • RES - Response (docket date:6/22/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2016
  • NOTE: BALDINO DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO ASHKENAZI PLAINTIFS MOTION TO STRIKE OR FOR SURREPLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • RES - Response (docket date:6/20/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • NOTE: BALDINO DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO ASHKENAZI PLAINTIFS NOTICE TO THE COURT REGARDING SETTLEMENT NEGOTIATIONS AND REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • MOT - Motion (docket date:6/20/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • NOTE: Plaintiffs: (1) Motion To Strike Defendants' June 16 "Supplemental Briefing . . .", And/Or (2) Alternative Request For Leave To File A Surreply To The Supplement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2016
  • STA - Statement (docket date:6/17/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
290 More Docket Entries
  • 02/18/2014
  • 066 - ME: Case Reassigned (docket date:2/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2014
  • NOT - Notice (docket date:2/14/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2014
  • NOTE: Notice of Errata

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2014
  • ACS - Acceptance Of Service (docket date:2/14/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2014
  • NOTE: Acceptance of Service/ROSS P MEYER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2014
  • APL - Application (docket date:2/13/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2014
  • NOTE: PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY RELIEF SHOULD NOT BE GRANTED ON PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2014
  • COM - Complaint (docket date:2/11/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2014
  • CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:2/11/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2014
  • CSH - Coversheet (docket date:2/11/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less