Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 05/31/2016 at 13:08:33 (UTC).

Rodger K Wolfram Et Al VS Hospice Compassus Inc Et Al

Case Summary

On 07/14/2010 Rodger K Wolfram filed an Other lawsuit against Hospice Compassus Inc. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northeast Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Brnovich, Susan. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2877

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Northeast Regional Court Center

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Brnovich, Susan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Rodger K Wolfram

D Carla Wolfram

Defendants

Hospice Compassus Inc

Heather M Driscoll-Lowe

North America Insurance Corp

Aviva Life & Annuity Co

Michael P Lowe

I N G U S A Annuity And Life Insurance Company

Lincoln National Corp

Bank Of America Corp

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Julio Zapata

ANN-MARTHA ANDREWS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2012
  • MFR - Motion For Reconsideration (docket date:5/9/2012) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2012
  • NOTE: MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM JUDGMENT AND ORDER FOR A NEW TRIAL FILED ON MARCH 19 2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2012
  • MOT - Motion (docket date:5/9/2012) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2012
  • NOTE: SECOND/TO EXPEDITE RULING ON MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT ORDER FOR A NEW TRIAL AND MOTION TO AMEND FILED ON MAY 25 2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2012
  • MOT - Motion (docket date:5/9/2012) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2012
  • NOTE: FOR RELIEF FROM JUDGMENT AND ORDER FOR A NEW TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2012
  • MOT - Motion (docket date:5/9/2012) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2012
  • NOTE: SECOND/TO EXPEDITE RULING ON MOTION TO STAY EXECUTION OF JUDGMENT FILED ON MAY 25 2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2012
  • MOT - Motion (docket date:5/9/2012) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2012
  • NOTE: TO EXPEDITE RULING ON MOTION TO STRIKE BANK OF AMERICAS ROGUE INPERTINENT AND CLADESTINE NOTICE OF LODGING PROPOSED FORM OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
227 More Docket Entries
  • 08/13/2010
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:8/27/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2010
  • NOTE: HEATHER M DRISCOLL-LOWE 08/04/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2010
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:8/27/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2010
  • NOTE: MICHAEL P DRISCOLL-LOWE 08/02/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2010
  • COM - Complaint (docket date:7/15/2010) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2010
  • CCA - Cert Compulsory Arbitration (docket date:7/15/2010) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2010
  • AFF - Affidavit (docket date:7/15/2010) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2010
  • NOTE: OF RODGER WOLFRAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2010
  • ADW - Application Deferral/Waiver (docket date:7/15/2010) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2010
  • ODF - Order Deferring Court Fees (docket date:7/15/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less