Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 06/03/2016 at 23:54:14 (UTC).

Robert Earl Kroncke VS Iafrate & Associates Et Al

Case Summary

On 07/20/2010 Robert Earl Kroncke filed an Other lawsuit against Iafrate Associates. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Southeast Court Complex located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Gass, David. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5293

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southeast Court Complex

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Gass, David

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Robert Earl Kroncke

Defendants

Iafrate & Associates

Courtney R Cloman

Bob Burns

City Of Phoenix

Jacqueline Jeffrey

Kirk Adams

Maricopa County Board Of Supervisors

Coy Hughes Johnston

State Of Arizona

City Of Mesa

Other

Pinal County Superior Court

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Courtney Glynn

Randall Garczynski

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2012
  • NOT - Notice (docket date:2/23/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2012
  • NOTE: Notice of Change of Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2012
  • NSC - Notice of Substitution of Counsel (docket date:2/23/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2012
  • NOTE: Notice of Substitution of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2012
  • OCW - Order for Withdrawal of Counsel (docket date:2/21/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2012
  • NOTE: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2012
  • MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel (docket date:1/25/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2012
  • NOTE: Motion to Withdraw As Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2011
  • NOT - Notice (docket date:5/16/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2011
  • NOTE: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
72 More Docket Entries
  • 04/16/2010
  • ORD - Order (docket date:7/20/2010) (filing party: Originating Court(3))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2010
  • NOTE: FOR FILING DOCUMENTS AND PAYMENT OF FILING FEE BY PRISONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2010
  • COM - Complaint (docket date:7/20/2010) (filing party: Originating Court(3))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2010
  • NOT - Notice (docket date:7/20/2010) (filing party: Originating Court(3))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2010
  • NOTE: OF CLAIM OF UNCONSTITUTIONALITY PURSUANT TO ARS 12-1841(B) AND ATTACHED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2010
  • CCA - Cert Compulsory Arbitration (docket date:7/20/2010) (filing party: Originating Court(3))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2010
  • NOT - Notice (docket date:7/20/2010) (filing party: Originating Court(3))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2010
  • NOTE: PROOF OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2010
  • ADW - Application Deferral/Waiver (docket date:7/20/2010) (filing party: Originating Court(3))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2010
  • ODF - Order Deferring Court Fees (docket date:7/20/2010) (filing party: Originating Court(3))

    Read MoreRead Less