This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/20/2021 at 01:03:36 (UTC).

Robert Dean Robens VS Chemayne Bonnie Schecter

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Robert Dean Robens filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Chemayne Bonnie Schecter. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Como, Greg. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4113

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Como, Greg

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Robert Dean Robens

Respondent

Chemayne Bonnie Schecter

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketNOTE:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketRNM - Returned Mail (docket date:2/3/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • JudgementJudgment Against:, Frequency: One Time, Type: Judgment Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Decree of Dissolution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketDDI - Decree Of Dissolution (docket date:12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketMAD - Motion And Affidavit For Default Dissolution (docket date:12/15/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketAAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default (docket date:11/25/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:10/9/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPIN - Preliminary Injunction (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less