This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 05/22/2016 at 04:15:09 (UTC).

Robert Anderson Et Al VS Denise Zamboni Et Al

Case Summary

On 04/20/2004 Robert Anderson filed an Other lawsuit against Denise Zamboni. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Gentry, Jo Lynn. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********7650

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Gentry, Jo Lynn

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Robert Anderson

Michelle Anderson

Defendants

Denise Zamboni

Paul S Zamboni

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Renee Gerstman

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

05/03/2004

AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:5/7/2004)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/03/2004

SUM - Summons (docket date:5/11/2004)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/30/2004

NDI - Notice Of Dismissal (docket date:5/6/2004)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/30/2004

NOTE: WITH PREJUDICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/20/2004

COM - Complaint (docket date:4/22/2004)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/20/2004

CCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To (docket date:4/22/2004)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less