This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/21/2021 at 23:11:40 (UTC).

Richard Weber VS Arizona Realty Sales Inc

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Richard Weber filed an Other lawsuit against Arizona Realty Sales Inc. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northeast Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Campagnolo, Theodore. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5195

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Northeast Regional Court Center

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Campagnolo, Theodore

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Richard Weber

Defendant

Arizona Realty Sales Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Christopher Charles

Defendant Attorney

Troy Stratman

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2021
  • HearingEvent: Pre-Trial Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • HearingEvent: Pre-Trial Conference; Result: Vacated & Reset

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketNOTE: STIPULATED MOTION TO AMEND SCHEDULING ORDER TO EXTEND CERTAIN DEADLINES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketMTA - Motion To Amend (docket date:2/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketSCO Scheduling Order (docket date:1/7/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Certificate of Good Faith Consultation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketCER - Certificate (docket date:12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Joint Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketJSR Joint Scheduling Report (docket date:12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Defendant Arizona Realty Sales, Inc. DBA Sonoran Properties Associates's Answer - EFILE BILLING $245

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketNOTE: ARIZONA REALTY SALES INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:10/5/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Certificate Of Compulsory Arbitration - Is Not Subject To

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Verified Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less