This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/20/2021 at 23:03:54 (UTC).

Rhonda L Spence VS Andrew Lamar Cole Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Rhonda L Spence filed an Other lawsuit against Andrew Lamar Cole. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northeast Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are Russell, Andrew and Agne, Sara. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5196

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Northeast Regional Court Center

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

Russell, Andrew

Agne, Sara

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rhonda L Spence

Defendants

Corey Lamar Cole

Andrew Lamar Cole

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Evan Goldstein

Defendant Attorney

Kevin Barth

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2021
  • HearingEvent: Pre-Trial Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketSCO Scheduling Order (docket date:12/2/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Joint Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketJSR Joint Scheduling Report (docket date:11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Certificate Regarding Compulsory Arbitration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketCCA - Cert Compulsory Arbitration (docket date:11/4/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Answer/EFILE BILLING $245

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketANS - Answer (docket date:11/4/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketNOTE: ANDREW LAMART COLE AND JANE DOE COLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:10/2/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketNOTE: COREY LAMAR COLE AND JANE DOE COLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:10/2/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNJT - Not Demand For Jury Trials (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less