This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/09/2021 at 20:31:26 (UTC).

Rene Michele Bledsoe VS Warren Lee Simpson

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Rene Michele Bledsoe filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Warren Lee Simpson. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are Ireland, Jacki and Edelstein, Monica. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5679

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

Ireland, Jacki

Edelstein, Monica

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Rene Michele Bledsoe

Respondent

Warren Lee Simpson

Minor

Party is a minor: name not published

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Kristen Dewitt-Lopez

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketNOTE: AFFIDAVIT OF ALTERNATIVE SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketAMS - Affidavit Alternative Method of Service (docket date:1/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketNLS - Notice Of Lack Of Service (docket date:11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: GRANITING MOTION FOR ALTERNATIVE SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketORD - Order (docket date:11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketNOTE: MOTION FOR ALTERNATIVE SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketMOT - Motion (docket date:11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketONA - Ord & Notice Attend Parent Inf (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less