This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/27/2021 at 23:04:10 (UTC).

Rem Plaza L L C VS Alexander W Nelson Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Rem Plaza L L C filed an Other lawsuit against Alexander W Nelson. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northeast Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are Russell, Andrew and Popham, Jr, Gary. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5198

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Northeast Regional Court Center

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

Russell, Andrew

Popham, Jr, Gary

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Rem Plaza L L C

R E M Plaza L L C

Defendants

Julia C Nelson

Alexander W Nelson

The Vapor Vault L L C

Vapor Vault L L C, The

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nancy Swift

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2020
  • Docket005 - ME: Hearing (docket date:12/4/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • HearingEvent: Default Hearing; Result: Minute Entry Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • JudgementJudgment For: R E M Plaza L L C Judgment Against: Vapor Vault L L C, The, Amount: $61,325.89, Frequency: One Time, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • JudgementJudgment For: R E M Plaza L L C Judgment Against: Vapor Vault L L C, The, Amount: $17,864.00, Frequency: One Time, Type: Charges

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • JudgementJudgment For: R E M Plaza L L C Judgment Against: Vapor Vault L L C, The, Amount: $5,907.05, Frequency: One Time, Type: Charges

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • JudgementJudgment For: R E M Plaza L L C Judgment Against: Vapor Vault L L C, The, Amount: $2,925.00, Frequency: One Time, Type: Attorney Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • JudgementJudgment For: R E M Plaza L L C Judgment Against: Vapor Vault L L C, The, Amount: $3,940.69, Frequency: One Time, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Copy mailed/provided to non-defl. parties on date of filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketDFJ - Default Judgment (docket date:12/2/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketNOTE: STATEMENT OF COSTS AND NOTICE OF TAXATION

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Certificate Of Compulsory Arbitration - Is Not Subject To

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less