This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/10/2021 at 17:00:04 (UTC).

Reflections And Discovery At Springfield Lakes Community Association VS Arnold H Budd Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Reflections And Discovery At Springfield Lakes Community Association filed an Other lawsuit against Arnold H Budd. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Duncan, Sally. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1705

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Duncan, Sally

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Reflections And Discovery At Springfield Lakes Community Association

Defendants

Evelyn R Budd

Cach, L L C

Wells Fargo Bank N A

Arnold H Budd

C A C H, L L C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Philip Brown

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketNOTE: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL / without prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketNDI - Notice Of Dismissal (docket date:12/2/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketNOTE: RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketNOT - Notice (docket date:12/2/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketNOTE: CACH LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketNOTE: ARNOLD H BUD AND EVELYN R BUD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:10/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketNOTE: WELLS FARGO BANK N A / BROOKLYN VANDEVENTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:10/6/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less