This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/10/2021 at 17:00:47 (UTC).

Rachel Quihuis VS Kyle Newman

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Rachel Quihuis filed an Other lawsuit against Kyle Newman. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Coury, Christopher. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1715

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Coury, Christopher

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rachel Quihuis

Defendant

Kyle Newman

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Daniel Brill

Defendant Attorney

Peter Kelly

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Certificate Regarding Compulsory Arbitration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketCCA - Cert Compulsory Arbitration (docket date:1/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Defendant's Answer-EFILE BILLING $245

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketANS - Answer (docket date:1/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketNOTE: KYLE NEWMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketAPU - Affidavit Of Publication (docket date:1/7/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: KYLE NEWMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketAPU - Affidavit Of Publication (docket date:12/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Certificate Of Compulsory Arbitration - Is Not Subject To

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less