This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/12/2021 at 22:12:08 (UTC).

R J F Investments 2017 L L C VS Crystal Rohlicek Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 R J F Investments 2017 L L C filed an Other lawsuit against Crystal Rohlicek. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northeast Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are Russell, Andrew and Agne, Sara. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5190

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Northeast Regional Court Center

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

Russell, Andrew

Agne, Sara

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

R J F Investments 2017 L L C

Defendants

Michael K Rowlands

Crystal Rohlicek

Michael Rowlands

Scottsdale Gold And Silver L L C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brian Weinberger

Defendant Attorney

Joshua Black

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2021
  • Docket023 - ME: Order Entered By Court (docket date:1/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketNOTE: MOTION TO EXTEND TIME FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketMXS - Motion To Extend Time For Service (docket date:1/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Answer/ eFile Billing $245.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketANS - Answer (docket date:10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketNOTE: CRYSTAL ROHLICEK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:10/1/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less