Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 06/29/2016 at 01:25:42 (UTC).

R C C Holdings L L C VS Thomas John Wheeler Et Al

Case Summary

On 07/06/2015 R C C Holdings L L C filed an Other lawsuit against Thomas John Wheeler. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Bergin, Dawn. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********7752

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Bergin, Dawn

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

R C C Holdings L L C

Defendants

Thomas John Wheeler

Rachael Rebecca Wheeler

Greencraft Interiors L L C

Greencraft Holdings L L C

Greencraft Stone And Tile L L C

Counter Defendant

Christine Lewis

Counter Claimants

Janie Miller

Tina Hislop

Jim Miller

Ian Hislop

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

Jennifer Phillips

Defendant Attorney

Monica Limon-Wynn

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2016
  • OCC - Order Continuing On Inactive Calendar (docket date:5/20/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • NOTE: ORDER CONTINUING CASE ON DISMISSAL CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • SFC - Stipulation For Continuance (docket date:5/10/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • NOTE: Stipulation to Continue on the Inactive Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • 375 - Case on Dismissal Calendar (docket date:3/14/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2016
  • ORD - Order (docket date:3/4/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2016
  • NOTE: ORDER GRANTING THE STIPULATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • NOS - Notice Of Settlement (docket date:3/4/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • NOTE: Joint Notice of Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • STP - Stipulation (docket date:2/23/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 08/06/2015
  • NOTE: Application and Affidavit for Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2015
  • MTD - Motion To Dismiss (docket date:8/7/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2015
  • NOTE: Defendants' Motion to Dismiss

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2015
  • NJR - Notice of change of Judge for right (docket date:8/5/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2015
  • NOTE: Notice Of Change Of Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • ACS - Acceptance Of Service (docket date:7/9/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • NOTE: Acceptance of Service THOMAS JOHN WHEELER, RACHAEL REBECCA WHEELER, GREENCRAFT INTERIORS LLC, GREENCRAFT HOLDINGS LLC, AND GREENCRAFT STONE AND TILE, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • COM - Complaint (docket date:7/7/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:7/7/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • CSH - Coversheet (docket date:7/7/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less