This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 10/13/2020 at 00:04:03 (UTC).

Quinton Brown VS Kristina Brown

Case Summary

On 02/25/2019 Quinton Brown filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Kristina Brown. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Southeast Court Complex located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Marwil, Suzanne. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3793

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southeast Court Complex

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Marwil, Suzanne

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Quinton Brown

Respondent

Kristina Brown

Minor

Party is a minor: name not published

Intervenors

(7) Dept Of Economic Security (DES)

Witness(7) Dept Of Economic Security (DES)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Intervenor Attorneys

Joanna Reihing

Joann Reihin

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketAOA Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006 (docket date:8/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketAOA Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006 (docket date:7/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • DocketAOA Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006 (docket date:5/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketAOA Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006 (docket date:3/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketAOA Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006 (docket date:1/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketAOA Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006 (docket date:12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketNOTE: Notice of the States Entry of Appearance/CO CHG $ REC # 27573514

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketNAR - Notice Of Appearance (docket date:12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • DocketNOTE:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • DocketIWO Income Withholding Order - Restricted Access (docket date:8/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 02/27/2019
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:3/1/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • DocketPWC - Parent Worksheet/Child Support (docket date:2/26/2019) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • DocketAFC - Affidavit Regarding Minor Children (docket date:2/26/2019) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • DocketPPL PARENTING PLAN (docket date:2/26/2019) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:2/26/2019) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • DocketONA - Ord & Notice Attend Parent Inf (docket date:2/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • DocketNCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins (docket date:2/26/2019) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • DocketPIN - Preliminary Injunction (docket date:2/26/2019) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:2/26/2019) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:2/26/2019) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less