This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 03/16/2018 at 03:01:37 (UTC).

Quality Loan Service Corp VS Maricopa County Treasurer

Case Summary

On 07/25/2017 Quality Loan Service Corp filed an Other lawsuit against Maricopa County Treasurer. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Southeast Court Complex located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are Mandell, Michael, Abramson, Lindsay and Benny, Margaret. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1170

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Southeast Court Complex

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

Mandell, Michael

Abramson, Lindsay

Benny, Margaret

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Quality Loan Service Corp

Defendant

Maricopa County Treasurer

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ross Mumme

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

09/13/2017

NOF - Notice Of Filing (docket date:9/14/2017)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2017

NOTE: Notice of Filing Certified Mailing Receipts

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2017

AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:8/2/2017)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2017

NOTE: MARICOPA COUNTY TREASURER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2017

SUM - Summons (docket date:7/28/2017)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/25/2017

COM - Complaint (docket date:7/26/2017)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/25/2017

CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:7/26/2017)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/25/2017

CSH - Coversheet (docket date:7/26/2017)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less