This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 05/21/2016 at 19:24:33 (UTC).

Principal Residential Mortgage VS Daniel Rivera Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/23/2004 Principal Residential Mortgage filed an Other lawsuit against Daniel Rivera. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northeast Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Brnovich, Susan. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3355

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Northeast Regional Court Center

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Brnovich, Susan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Principal Residential Mortgage

Defendants

Daniel Rivera

Sarai Rivera

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARK BOSCO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

03/04/2004

JFD - Judgment Forcible Detainer (docket date:3/18/2004)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/04/2004

NOTE: Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/04/2004

AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:3/19/2004)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/04/2004

NOTE: DANIEL RIVERA AND SARAI RIVERA SERVED 02/23/04

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/04/2004

SUM - Summons (docket date:4/7/2004)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/23/2004

COM - Complaint (docket date:2/26/2004)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less