This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/10/2021 at 16:52:47 (UTC).

Prime Acceptance Corp VS Christopher Jones Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Prime Acceptance Corp filed an Other lawsuit against Christopher Jones. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is White, Susan. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1675

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

White, Susan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Prime Acceptance Corp

Defendants

Christopher Jones

Stephanie Jones

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David Seidberg

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/24/2020
  • JudgementJudgment For: Prime Acceptance Corp Judgment Against: Christopher Jones Judgment Against: Stephanie Jones, Amount: $14,053.60, Frequency: One Time, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • JudgementJudgment For: Prime Acceptance Corp Judgment Against: Christopher Jones Judgment Against: Stephanie Jones, Amount: $446.39, Frequency: One Time, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Copy mailed/provided to non-defl. parties on date of filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • DocketDFJ - Default Judgment (docket date:12/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Motion and Affidavit for Entry of Judgment by Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketMAJ - Mot/Aff Entry Def Jud W/O Hear (docket date:12/8/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • Docket023 - ME: Order Entered By Court (docket date:11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Application and Affidavit for Default/Entry of Default and Notice of Application for Entry of Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketAAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default (docket date:11/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketNOTE: CHRISTOPHER JONES

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Certificate Of Compulsory Arbitration - Is Subject To

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less