This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/10/2021 at 17:17:42 (UTC).

Portfolio Recovery Associates L L C VS Raul F Gutierrez

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Portfolio Recovery Associates L L C filed an Other lawsuit against Raul F Gutierrez. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1883

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Portfolio Recovery Associates L L C

Defendant

Raul F Gutierrez

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jacqueline Ligas

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2021
  • Docket023 - ME: Order Entered By Court (docket date:1/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Application for Entry of Default AND AFFIDAVIT OF DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketAAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default (docket date:1/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketNOTE: NOTICE OF FILING - Declaration of Service/RAUL F GUTIERREZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketAMS - Affidavit Alternative Method of Service (docket date:12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketOXS - Order To Extend Time For Service (docket date:11/3/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketNOTE: AUTHORIZING ALTERNATIVE SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketORD - Order (docket date:11/3/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketNOTE: MOTION FOR ORDER AUTHORIZING ALTERNATIVE SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketMOT - Motion (docket date:10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Request for an Extension of Time for Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketMXS - Motion To Extend Time For Service (docket date:10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To (docket date:9/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less