This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/10/2021 at 17:16:22 (UTC).

Portfolio Recovery Associates L L C VS Amanda M Smith

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Portfolio Recovery Associates L L C filed an Other lawsuit against Amanda M Smith. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1879

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Portfolio Recovery Associates L L C

Defendant

Amanda M Smith

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jacqueline Ligas

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Motion for Entry of Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketMAJ - Mot/Aff Entry Def Jud W/O Hear (docket date:12/9/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • Docket023 - ME: Order Entered By Court (docket date:11/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketNOTE: APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND AFFIDAVIT OF DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketAAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default (docket date:11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketNOTE: NOTICE OF FILING - DECLARATION OF SERVICE - AMANDA SMITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:10/8/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To (docket date:9/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less