This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/12/2021 at 22:12:57 (UTC).

Peter Strojnik VS G6 Hospitality L L C Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Peter Strojnik filed an Other lawsuit against G6 Hospitality L L C. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northeast Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Campagnolo, Theodore. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5199

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Northeast Regional Court Center

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Campagnolo, Theodore

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Peter Strojnik

Defendants

G6 Hospitality L L C

Phoenix North Bell M6 L L C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Lindsay Leavitt

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2021
  • HearingEvent: Pre-Trial Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • Docket028 - ME: Status Conference Set (docket date:2/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketLRM-Letter of Remand from Federal District Court (docket date:2/9/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketCAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid (docket date:10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Defendants' Notice of Removal to Federal Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketNUS - Notice Of Removal Us District Court (docket date:10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketNOTE: DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketNAR - Notice Of Appearance (docket date:10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:10/7/2020) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketNOTE: PHOENIX NORTH BELL M6 L L C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:10/5/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketNOTE: G6 HOSPITALITY L L C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:10/5/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

    Read MoreRead Less