This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/27/2021 at 23:04:00 (UTC).

Paula Flores VS Joe Flores

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Paula Flores filed an Other lawsuit against Joe Flores. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northeast Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5189

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Northeast Regional Court Center

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Paula Flores

Defendant

Joe Flores

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

William Wolf

Defendant Attorney

Brett Donaldson

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketNOTE: TO ARIZONA STATE BOARD OF PHARMACY TO RELEASE CONTROLLED SUBSTANCES PRESCRIPTION MONITORING DATABASE INFORMATION REGARDING PAULA FLORES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketORD - Order (docket date:2/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketNOTE: STIPULATION TO OBTAIN PHARMACY CONTROL BOARD SUBSTANCE RECORDS OF PLAINTIFF PAULA FLORES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketSTP - Stipulation (docket date:2/5/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/25/2020
  • Docket324 - ME: Notice Of Appointment Of Arbitrator (docket date:12/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • Docket352 - ME: Excuse Arbitrator From Case (docket date:12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Notice of Recusal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketNOT - Notice (docket date:12/9/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • Docket324 - ME: Notice Of Appointment Of Arbitrator (docket date:12/4/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • Docket023 - ME: Order Entered By Court (docket date:11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketANS - Answer (docket date:10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketNOTE: MARIA FLORES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:10/5/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketNOTE: JOE FLORES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:10/5/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:10/1/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:10/1/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less