This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/12/2021 at 22:10:15 (UTC).

Party is a minor: name not published, Tiffany House Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Party is a minor name not published, Tiffany House was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northeast Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Popham, Jr, Gary. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5167

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Northeast Regional Court Center

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Popham, Jr, Gary

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tiffany House

In Re

Party is a minor: name not published

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2021
  • Docket022 - ME: Order Signed (docket date:1/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • HearingEvent: Name Change Hearing; Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Copy of order mailed/provided to parties on date of filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketOCN - Order Change of Name (docket date:1/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketAPU - Affidavit Of Publication (docket date:1/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • Docket003 - ME: Hearing Reset (docket date:12/9/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • HearingEvent: Name Change Hearing; Result: Vacated & Reset

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • HearingEvent: Name Change Hearing; Result: Vacated & Reset

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • Docket056 - ME: Hearing Set (docket date:10/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/25/2020) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketAPE - Application/Petition (docket date:9/25/2020) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

    Read MoreRead Less