This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 03/22/2021 at 11:10:22 (UTC).

Party is a minor: name not published, Thomas Frederick Malafa Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/30/2020 Party is a minor name not published, Thomas Frederick Malafa was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northwest Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are Bustamante, Lori and VandenBerg, Lisa. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0387

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Courthouse:

    Northwest Regional Court Center

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

Bustamante, Lori

VandenBerg, Lisa

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Thomas Frederick Malafa

Minor

Party is a minor: name not published

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Sharon Ravenscroft

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

04/02/2020

HearingEvent: Compliance Hearing; Result: Vacated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/02/2020

HearingEvent: Compliance Hearing; Result: Vacated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/06/2020

DocketNOTE: THOMAS FREDERICK MALAFA / WITHOUT RESTRICTION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/06/2020

DocketLTA - Letter Of Appointment (docket date:3/10/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/06/2020

DocketBON - Bond (docket date:3/10/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/03/2020

Docket421- Appoint Guardian/Consev (docket date:3/3/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/02/2020

HearingEvent: Guardian/Conservator - Minor; Result: Order Signed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/02/2020

DocketNOTE: FOR COMPLIANCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/02/2020

DocketORD - Order (docket date:3/4/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/02/2020

DocketOCM - Order Appt Conservator Of Minor Child (docket date:3/4/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
02/11/2020

DocketNOTE: REGARDING CONSERVATORSHIP

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/11/2020

DocketNOH - Notice Of Hearing (docket date:2/12/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/11/2020

DocketNOTE: OF NOTICE PROVIDED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/11/2020

DocketDCL - Declaration (docket date:2/12/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/30/2020

DocketNOTE: TOM MALAFA / CONSERVATORSHIP

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/30/2020

DocketDCC - Declaration/Certificate of Completion (docket date:1/30/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/30/2020

DocketAFP - Affidavit of Proposed Appointee (docket date:1/30/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/30/2020

DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:1/30/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/30/2020

DocketPIF - Probate Information Sheet/Form - Restricted Access (docket date:1/30/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/30/2020

DocketAPE - Application/Petition (docket date:1/30/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less