This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 07/18/2016 at 15:45:09 (UTC).

Party is a minor: name not published, Natalie Anne Tripoli Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/29/2007 Party is a minor name not published, Natalie Anne Tripoli was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Schwartz, Aryeh. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1496

  • Filing Date:

    05/29/2007

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Schwartz, Aryeh

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Natalie Anne Tripoli

Minor

Party is a minor: name not published

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

James Shields

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

07/06/2011

PRD - Proof Of Restricted Account (docket date:7/7/2011)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2011

NOTE: FROM DEPOSITORY OR FINANCIAL INSTITUTION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/30/2011

023 - ME: Order Entered By Court (docket date:6/30/2011)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/28/2011

002 - ME: Hearing Vacated (docket date:4/28/2011)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/07/2011

NOT - Notice (docket date:4/8/2011)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/07/2011

NOTE: TO THE COURT OF ESTABLISHMENT OF RESTRICTED ACCOUNT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/22/2011

087 - ME: Order To Show Cause Issued (docket date:3/22/2011)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/27/2010

431- Review For Compliance (docket date:12/27/2010)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/02/2010

005 - ME: Hearing (docket date:9/2/2010)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/01/2010

ORD - Order (docket date:9/3/2010)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
27 More Docket Entries
06/07/2007

NOTE: AMENDED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/06/2007

NOH - Notice Of Hearing (docket date:6/11/2007)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/29/2007

APE - Application/Petition (docket date:5/30/2007)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/29/2007

WNO - Waiver Of Notice (docket date:5/30/2007)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/29/2007

NOTE: OF HEARING ON PETITION REGARDING CONSERVATORSHIP NATALIE TRIPOLI

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/29/2007

AFF - Affidavit (docket date:5/30/2007)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/29/2007

NOTE: OF PERSON TO BE APPOINTED GUARDIAN AND OR CONSERVATOR

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/29/2007

NOT - Notice (docket date:5/30/2007)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/29/2007

NOTE: CONSENT OF PARENT TO CONSERVATORSHIP OF A MINOR CHILD AND WAIVER OF NOTICE NATALIE TRIPOLI

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/29/2007

PIF - Probate Information Sheet/Form - Restricted Access (docket date:5/30/2007)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less