This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 07/23/2016 at 06:49:02 (UTC).

Party is a minor: name not published, Becky Jo Fincher Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/14/2011 Party is a minor name not published, Becky Jo Fincher was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northeast Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Rees, Brian. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3113

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Northeast Regional Court Center

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Rees, Brian

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Becky Jo Fincher

In Re

Party is a minor: name not published

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

08/05/2011

OCN - Order Change of Name (docket date:8/9/2011)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/05/2011

NOTE: Copy of order mailed/provided to parties on date of filing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/05/2011

APU - Affidavit Of Publication (docket date:8/10/2011) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/20/2011

NOH - Notice Of Hearing (docket date:6/22/2011) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/20/2011

NOTE: REGARDING APPLICATION FOR CHANGE OF NAME

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/14/2011

COM - Complaint (docket date:6/15/2011) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less