This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 10/19/2020 at 09:22:27 (UTC).

Pacifico Soldati VS Kelly Soldati

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Pacifico Soldati filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Kelly Soldati. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is LeMaire, Kerstin. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5667

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

LeMaire, Kerstin

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Pacifico Soldati

Respondent

Kelly Soldati

Minor

Party is a minor: name not published

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Andrea Lawrence

Respondent Attorney

Cynthia Kelley

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2020
  • HearingEvent: Temporary Orders

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • HearingEvent: Temporary Orders; Result: Vacated & Reset

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Parent Education Certificate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketPEC - Parent Education Certificate (docket date:10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Parent Education Certificate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketPEC - Parent Education Certificate (docket date:10/7/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketNOTE: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR RESPONDENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketNAR - Notice Of Appearance (docket date:10/5/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketNOTE: RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF NON-COVENANT MARRIAGE (WITH CHILDREN) PD 274 R# 27971275

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketANS - Answer (docket date:10/5/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketAFI - Affidavit of Financial Information, Restricted after 1/1/06 (docket date:9/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPIN - Preliminary Injunction (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketONA - Ord & Notice Attend Parent Inf (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNAR - Notice Of Appearance (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: FOR PARENTING TIME/LEGAL DECISION MAKING AUTHORITY AND CHILD SUPPORT AND FOR AN AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPTO - PETITION/MOTION FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less