This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/27/2018 at 04:54:45 (UTC).

P T L Partners L L C VS Royce T Flora Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/08/2017 P T L Partners L L C filed an Other lawsuit against Royce T Flora. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Southeast Court Complex located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Udall, David. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2585

  • Filing Date:

    05/08/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Southeast Court Complex

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Udall, David

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

P T L Partners L L C

P T L, R E Corp

Defendants

Royce T Flora

City Of Phoenix

Arizona Federal Credit Union

Susan K Warren

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Eric Kessler

Defendant Attorneys

Dustin McBride

Brian Cosper

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

10/09/2017

023 - ME: Order Entered By Court (docket date:10/9/2017)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/03/2017

JUD - Judgment (docket date:10/5/2017)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/03/2017

NOTE: Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/03/2017

DFJ - Default Judgment (docket date:10/5/2017)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/03/2017

NOTE: Copy mailed/provided to non-defl. parties on date of filing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/03/2017

NOT - Notice (docket date:10/5/2017)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/03/2017

NOTE: OF SUBSTITUTION OF PARTIES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2017

CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid (docket date:9/14/2017)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2017

NOTE: Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2017

NOT - Notice (docket date:9/12/2017)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
17 More Docket Entries
05/11/2017

NOTE: CITY OF PHOENIX

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/11/2017

AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:5/15/2017)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/11/2017

NOTE: ARIZONA FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/11/2017

AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:5/15/2017)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/11/2017

NOTE: ROYCE T FLORA, MARICOPA COUNTY TREASURER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/08/2017

COM - Complaint (docket date:5/9/2017)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/08/2017

CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:5/9/2017)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/08/2017

CSH - Coversheet (docket date:5/9/2017)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/03/2017

Judgment Against:, Frequency: One Time, Type: Judgment Only

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/03/2017

Judgment Against:, Frequency: One Time, Type: Judgment Only

[+] Read More [-] Read Less