This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 06/04/2016 at 12:53:41 (UTC).

Otto Kruger Investments L L C VS (2) Maricopa County

Case Summary

On 12/15/2008 Otto Kruger Investments L L C filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against 2 Maricopa County. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Barth, Michael. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0704

  • Filing Date:

    12/15/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Barth, Michael

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Otto Kruger Investments L L C

Defendant

(2) Maricopa County

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jeff Springer

Defendant Attorney

Rachelle Leibsohn

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2009
  • 371 - Me: Judgment Signed - Prop Tax (docket date:10/6/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2009
  • JUD - Judgment (docket date:10/14/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2009
  • NOTE: Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2009
  • NOT - Notice (docket date:9/30/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2009
  • NOTE: STIPULATED APPROVAL OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2009
  • OCC - Order Continuing On Inactive Calendar (docket date:9/22/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2009
  • MCC - Mot/Cont On Inactive Calendar (docket date:9/14/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2009
  • 078 - ME: Case On Dismissal Calendar (docket date:5/29/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2009
  • 064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset (docket date:3/31/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2009
  • ORD - Order (docket date:4/10/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/23/2009
  • STP - Stipulation (docket date:3/24/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2009
  • NOTE: TO CONTINUE TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2009
  • 089 - ME: Trial Setting (docket date:2/6/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2009
  • NOT - Notice (docket date:1/13/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2009
  • NOTE: ERRATA TO ANSWER TO COMPLAINT AND NOTICE OF APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2009
  • ANS - Answer (docket date:1/13/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2009
  • NOTE: TO COMPLAINT AND NOTICE OF APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2008
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:12/17/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2008
  • COM - Complaint (docket date:12/16/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2008
  • NOTE: AND NOTICE OF APPEAL PROPERTY TAX APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less